This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 07:02:11 (UTC).

United States of America v. 86,147.85 USD In U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 86,147 85 USD In U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roger T. Benitez, Andrew G. Schopler and William Q. Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00992

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

Presiding Judges

Roger T. Benitez

William Q. Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

Kyra Foster

Crystal Westbrooks

Respondent

86,147.05 USD In U.S. Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent A Whittlesey

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Brent Whittlesey

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Claimant Attorneys

Richard M Barnett

Attorney at Law Offices of Richard M Barnett

105 West F Street, Fourth Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Michael Cindrich

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael E Cindrich APC

225 Broadway Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Ernie W Chen

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael E Cindrich APC

225 Broadway Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Ernie W. Chen

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael E Cindrich APC

225 Broadway Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#31

RESTRICTED

29 #3

Exhibit B

29 #2

Exhibit A

29 #1

Declaration

#29

(#29) MOTION to Compel to Compel Responses To First Set Of Special Interrogatories To Claimant Kyra Foster by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Whittlesey, Brent) (ag). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#28

(#28) MOTION (Stipulated Request) For Order Authorizing Telephonic Appearance At Early Neutral Evaluation by United States of America. (Whittlesey, Brent) (ag). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kyra Foster.(Barnett, Richard) (ag). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) Vacating Prior Scheduling Order; (2) For Early Neutral Evaluation; (3) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/31/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/31/2019.(anh) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#24

(#24) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Whittlesey, Brent) (jao). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#10

(#10) CLAIM filed by Claimant Kyra Foster. (Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#8

(#8) WARRANT for seizure of $86,147.85 In U.S. Currency issued on Complaint #1 . (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM RE ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 03/22/2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#1

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kyra Foster.(Barnett, Richard) (ag). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America (Whittlesey, Brent) (ag). (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER (AGS): Plaintiff's counsel's request to appear telephonically at the Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF No. #28 ) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/23/2019. (no document attached) (mjg) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION to Compel to Compel Responses To First Set Of Special Interrogatories To Claimant Kyra Foster by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Whittlesey, Brent) (ag). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION (Stipulated Request) For Order Authorizing Telephonic Appearance At Early Neutral Evaluation by United States of America. (Whittlesey, Brent) (ag). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kyra Foster.(Barnett, Richard) (ag). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#26) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0992-WQH-AGS.(no document attached) (anh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) Vacating Prior Scheduling Order; (2) For Early Neutral Evaluation; (3) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/31/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/31/2019.(anh) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Whittlesey, Brent) (jao). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#23) Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jpp) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-00518. Original file received electronically (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLAIM filed by Claimant Kyra Foster. (Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WARRANT for seizure of $86,147.85 In U.S. Currency issued on Complaint #1 . (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM RE ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 03/22/2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attorney Brent A Whittlesey added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.