This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2019 at 07:57:03 (UTC).

United States of America v. $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 8,064 00 in U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joshua P Kolar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joshua P Kolar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$8,064.00 in U.S. Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Orest S Szewciw - AUSA

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - Ham/IN

5400 Federal Plz Ste 1500

Hammond, IN 46320

Defendant Attorney

Quinton L Ellis

1200 Lincoln Tower, 116 E Berry Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802-2405

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT IN REM against $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons /Warrant for Arrest in REM)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 (kjp) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 DIRECT NOTICE OF JUDICIAL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#5

(#5) CLAIM Verified Claim In Rem by $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency. (Ellis, Quinton) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#9

(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/25/2019. (tc) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

3 #1

DIRECT NOTICE OF JUDICIAL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS

#2

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) VERIFIED AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint IN REM AND WARRANT AND SUMMONS FOR ARREST IN REM by $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency.(Ellis, Quinton) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Quinton L Ellis on behalf of $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency (Ellis, Quinton) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons /Warrant for Arrest in REM

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 (kjp) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) VERIFIED AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint IN REM AND WARRANT AND SUMMONS FOR ARREST IN REM by $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency.(Ellis, Quinton) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER: Court STRIKES #6 Verified Answer and Defenses to Verified Complaint in Rem and Warrant and Summons for Arrest in Rem. N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1 requires responsive pleadings to restate verbatim the paragraphs from the pleading they respond to and, immediately following each restated paragraph, to state the response to that paragraph. The Court GRANTS LEAVE for Defendant to file an answer that complies with the local rule by 9/11/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/4/2019. Text entry order. (tc) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/25/2019. (tc) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference/Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Kolar's case manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours in advance of the conference. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/4/2019. Text entry order. (tc) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/4/2019. (tc) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STRICKEN RE 10 ORDER: VERIFIED ANSWER to #1 Complaint IN REM AND WARRANT AND SUMMONS FOR ARREST IN REM by $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency.(Ellis, Quinton) Modified on 9/4/2019 (tc). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLAIM Verified Claim In Rem by $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency. (Ellis, Quinton) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Quinton L Ellis on behalf of $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency (Ellis, Quinton) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 DIRECT NOTICE OF JUDICIAL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WARRANT for ARREST IN REM issued. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (jat) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (jat) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT IN REM against $8,064.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons /Warrant for Arrest in REM)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.