This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2019 at 07:42:37 (UTC).

United States of America v. 8 Clay Street, Hopkinton, RI

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 8 Clay Street, Hopkinton, RI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

Yong Xiong Lei

Defendant

Real Property Located at 8 Clay Street, Hopkinton, Rhode Island

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary Rogers

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

50 Kennedy Plaza

Providence, RI 02903

Claimant Attorney

Steven D. DiLibero

Attorney at DiLibero and Associates

130 Dorrance St., 453-0600, Fax: 331-9503

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

7 #7

Exhibit 7

7 #6

Exhibit 6

7 #5

Exhibit 5

7 #4

Exhibit 4

7 #3

Exhibit 3

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Vacate #5 Order on Motion for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Replies due by 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#4

(#4) CLAIM Verified Claim of Ownership by Yong Xiong Lei. (DiLibero, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Yong Xiong Lei.(DiLibero, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

2 #1

Writ of Entry

#2

(#2) MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Declaration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Vacate #5 Order on Motion for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Replies due by 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: #6 Motion to Vacate scheduled for Wednesday 4/3/2019 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Vacate #5 Order on Motion for Writ filed by Yong Xiong Lei. Responses due by 4/2/2019. (DiLibero, Steven) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLAIM Verified Claim of Ownership by Yong Xiong Lei. (DiLibero, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Yong Xiong Lei.(DiLibero, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less