This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:57:50 (UTC).

United States of America v. $74,117.00 United States Currency

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 74,117 00 United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael A. Telesca. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06881

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Telesca

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$74,117.00 United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grace M. Carducci

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

100 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Arrest Warrant in Rem

#3

(#3) WARRANT IN REM Returned executed as to DEA. (TF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against $74,117.00 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant in Rem)(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WARRANT IN REM Returned executed as to DEA. (TF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to chambers of online civil opening. (LB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against $74,117.00 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant in Rem)(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.