This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2019 at 07:24:46 (UTC).

United States of America v. $67,020 in U.S. Currency et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 67,020 in U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hildy Bowbeer and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01614

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

$77,573 in U.S. Currency

$67,020 in U.S. Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig R Baune

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

300 S 4Th St. Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WARRANT Returned Executed as to $67,020 and $77,573. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/29/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against All Defendants filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WARRANT Returned Executed as to $67,020 and $77,573. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/29/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1614 (WMW/HB). (MMP) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against All Defendants filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.