This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:25:09 (UTC).

United States of America v. Real Property Located at 617 Shannon Avenue, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against Real Property Located at 617 Shannon Avenue, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00156

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

508 Menlo Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411

617 Shannon Avenue, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411

Real Property Located at 508 Menlo Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411

Real Property Located at 617 Shannon Avenue, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gretchen Jenkins Mohr

Attorney at U S Department of Justice (Knox USAO)

800 Market Street, Suite 211

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay until the related criminal investigation has been concluded, and any resulting criminal action has been disposed of at the trial court level, either through a verdict or by way of a plea. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/19. (AWS) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#7

(#4) ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT as to Jerriod Ray Sivels, Jamaal Parker, Anthony Poindexter, Kelvin White, Deonta Banks, Lovest Carter, Darious Garrett. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign the newly filed unassigned cases, 1:19-cv-156, styled United States of America v. Real Properties Located at 617 Shannon Avenue and 508 Menlo Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 and 1:19- cv-157, styled United States of America v. Real Property Located at 500 Phoenix Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed criminal case 1:19-cr-46-TRM-SKL, styled United States of America v. Jerriod Sivels, et al. The Clerk of the Court is directed to bring this matter to the attention of the Chief United States District Judge for possible reassignment of case number 1:19-cv-155-JRG-SKL, styled United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3505 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 to the district judge assigned to the previously filed criminal case 1:19-cr-46-TRM-SKL, styled United States of America v. Jerriod Sivels, et al and civil cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/24/19. (CNC) (CNC) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Mohr, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint IN REM by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of William Wise

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT IN REM against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of William Wise)(Mohr, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay until the related criminal investigation has been concluded, and any resulting criminal action has been disposed of at the trial court level, either through a verdict or by way of a plea. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/19. (AWS) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 1:19-cv-00157-TRM-SKL. (CNC) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CNC) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT as to Jerriod Ray Sivels, Jamaal Parker, Anthony Poindexter, Kelvin White, Deonta Banks, Lovest Carter, Darious Garrett. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign the newly filed unassigned cases, 1:19-cv-156, styled United States of America v. Real Properties Located at 617 Shannon Avenue and 508 Menlo Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 and 1:19- cv-157, styled United States of America v. Real Property Located at 500 Phoenix Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed criminal case 1:19-cr-46-TRM-SKL, styled United States of America v. Jerriod Sivels, et al. The Clerk of the Court is directed to bring this matter to the attention of the Chief United States District Judge for possible reassignment of case number 1:19-cv-155-JRG-SKL, styled United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3505 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 to the district judge assigned to the previously filed criminal case 1:19-cr-46-TRM-SKL, styled United States of America v. Jerriod Sivels, et al and civil cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/24/19. (CNC) (CNC) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Lee for related case determination. (JCK) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Mohr, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint IN REM by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT IN REM against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of William Wise)(Mohr, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.