This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:27:23 (UTC).

United States of America v. $588,453.25 in United States Currency in Bank of America Account Number x8909 in the Name of James Dunbar et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 588,453 25 in United States Currency in Bank of America Account Number x8909 in the Name of James Dunbar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00164

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

$44,810.33 in United States Currency in First Republic Bank Account Number x2996 in the name of Ashton B Vines

$859,049.90 in United States Currency in JP Morgan Chase Account Number x8305 in the Name of Vines Investments Inc.

$588,453.25 in United States Currency in Bank of America Account Number x8909 in the Name of James Dunbar

$251,758.06 in United States Currency in Bank of America Account Number x7317 in the Name of Shelby R Carter Sole Prop

$265,000.00 in United States Currency in Central Trust Bank Account Number x6587 in the Name of James Dunbar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy B. Blackburn

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER EXTENDING RESTRAINING ORDER FOR 90 DAYS granting #8 Motion to Extend. All financial institutions, including their agents and employees, holding any of the funds in the accounts listed on Attachment 1 (the Properties) are ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from transferring (by wire or other means), conveying, diminishing, or disposing of the Properties, funds and monies held in the accounts described in Attachment 1 for an additional 90 days to and including July 26, 2019. All persons including James Dunbar, Shelby R. Carter, Vines Investments, Inc. and Ashton B. Vines, and their agents, servants, employees, attorneys, family members and those persons in active concert or participation with them, are hereby ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from withdrawing, distributing, giving away, encumbering or otherwise removing from the jurisdiction of this Court, or from any checking or savings account, any interest in funds or monies obtained or received, directly or indirectly (from another account listed above) from the victim company, namely, Malnove Holding Company, Inc. (Malnove), without prior approval of the Court upon notice to the United States and an opportunity for the United States to be heard for an additional 90 days, to and including July 26, 2019. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit 1 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to file under Seal an Exhibit by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#6

(#6) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, AND SECURE THE DEFENDANT PROPERTY - NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 983(j)(3), THAT: All financial institutions holding any of the funds in the accounts fully listed with all numbers of the accounts on Attachment 1 (the Properties) are ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from transferring (by wire or other means), conveying, diminishing, or disposing of the Properties, funds and monies held in the accounts described in Attachment 1 Such financial institutions shall continue to receive and credit monies to the identified accounts and such funds shall be subject to this Order and restrained pursuant to its terms. The terms of this Order shall remain in full force and effect for a period not to exceed 14 days from the date of entry of this Order, unless this Court extends the term of this Order for good cause shown or by agreement of the interested persons or entities. Should the United States file a civil forfeiture complaint against any of the properties prior to the expiration of this Order, this Restraining Order shall continue in full effect as to those Properties until further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Extend Restraining Order for 90 Days #6 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER EXTENDING RESTRAINING ORDER FOR 90 DAYS granting #8 Motion to Extend. All financial institutions, including their agents and employees, holding any of the funds in the accounts listed on Attachment 1 (the Properties) are ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from transferring (by wire or other means), conveying, diminishing, or disposing of the Properties, funds and monies held in the accounts described in Attachment 1 for an additional 90 days to and including July 26, 2019. All persons including James Dunbar, Shelby R. Carter, Vines Investments, Inc. and Ashton B. Vines, and their agents, servants, employees, attorneys, family members and those persons in active concert or participation with them, are hereby ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from withdrawing, distributing, giving away, encumbering or otherwise removing from the jurisdiction of this Court, or from any checking or savings account, any interest in funds or monies obtained or received, directly or indirectly (from another account listed above) from the victim company, namely, Malnove Holding Company, Inc. (Malnove), without prior approval of the Court upon notice to the United States and an opportunity for the United States to be heard for an additional 90 days, to and including July 26, 2019. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit 1 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Extend Restraining Order for 90 Days #6 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, AND SECURE THE DEFENDANT PROPERTY - NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 983(j)(3), THAT: All financial institutions holding any of the funds in the accounts fully listed with all numbers of the accounts on Attachment 1 (the Properties) are ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from transferring (by wire or other means), conveying, diminishing, or disposing of the Properties, funds and monies held in the accounts described in Attachment 1 Such financial institutions shall continue to receive and credit monies to the identified accounts and such funds shall be subject to this Order and restrained pursuant to its terms. The terms of this Order shall remain in full force and effect for a period not to exceed 14 days from the date of entry of this Order, unless this Court extends the term of this Order for good cause shown or by agreement of the interested persons or entities. Should the United States file a civil forfeiture complaint against any of the properties prior to the expiration of this Order, this Restraining Order shall continue in full effect as to those Properties until further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • (#4) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JAB) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to file under Seal an Exhibit by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.