This case was last updated from PACER on 03/22/2020 at 07:16:05 (UTC).

United States of America v. $50,596.05 United States Currency

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 50,596 05 United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael D. Nelson and Laurie Smith Camp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

Presiding Judge

Laurie Smith Camp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$50,596.05 United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy B. Blackburn

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Certificate of Service of UNITED STATES's SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Alfredo Valencia Hinostroza (Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#12

(#12) Verified CLAIM by Alfredo Valencia Hinostroza (Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Oath of Admission for Pro Hac Vice Motion by Attorney Anthony P. Capozzi on behalf of Defendant $50,596.05 United States Currency (Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4119401 by Attorney Anthony P. Capozzi on behalf of Defendant $50,596.05 United States Currency.(Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice and Warrant on 1/27/2020 upon U.S. Customs and Border Protection by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #4 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#3

(#3) WARRANT IN REM Issued. Emailed to USA. (LKO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $50,596.05 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Service of UNITED STATES's SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Alfredo Valencia Hinostroza (Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Verified CLAIM by Alfredo Valencia Hinostroza (Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Anthony P. Capozzi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Oath of Admission for Pro Hac Vice Motion by Attorney Anthony P. Capozzi on behalf of Defendant $50,596.05 United States Currency (Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4119401 by Attorney Anthony P. Capozzi on behalf of Defendant $50,596.05 United States Currency.(Capozzi, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice and Warrant on 1/27/2020 upon U.S. Customs and Border Protection by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #4 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WARRANT IN REM Issued. Emailed to USA. (LKO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $50,596.05 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less