This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2019 at 09:30:51 (UTC).

United States of America v. 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 45,413 65 dollars in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Anderson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02091

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

Lamar Graves

Defendant

45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrie Fisher Sherard

Attorney at US Attorneys Office (Gville)

55 Beattie Place, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant and Claimant Attorney

Rose Mary Parham

Attorney at Parham Law Office

Po Box 1514

Florence, SC 29503

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#6

(#6) WARRANT Returned as to in rem property/cash. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem with Return)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency (Filing fee waived), filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Julie Yelk)(mflo, ) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct text(mflo, ). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (mflo, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

6 #1

Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem with Return

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) CLAIM Verified claim by 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency. (Parham, Rose) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#10

(#10) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Mary Parham on behalf of 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency (Parham, Rose) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

10 #1

Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report

1 #1

Verification of Julie Yelk

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency.(Parham, Rose) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (mflo, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency.(Parham, Rose) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLAIM Verified claim by 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency. (Parham, Rose) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Mary Parham on behalf of 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency (Parham, Rose) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WARRANT Returned as to in rem property/cash. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem with Return)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (mflo, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (mflo, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency (Filing fee waived), filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Julie Yelk)(mflo, ) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct text(mflo, ). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.