This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:21:11 (UTC).

United States of America v. $37,200.00 in United States Currency

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 37,200 00 in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and Joseph F. Bataillon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00302

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$37,200.00 in United States Currency

Acampo, CA 95220

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy B. Blackburn

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) INDEX in support of MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #8 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #5 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $37,200.00 in United States Currency, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#10

(#10) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant $37,200.00 in United States Currency (Christopher Emerson). Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to defendant) (KLF) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Amend MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #11 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - The Motion for Default Judgment is hereby granted with regard to Christopher Emerson. All right, title and interest in or to $37,200.00 U.S. currency of the defendant property held by Christopher Emerson is hereby forever barred and foreclosed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to defaulted defendant) (KMM) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#12

(#12) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#4

(#4) WARRANT IN REM Issued. (LKO) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

9 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - The Motion for Default Judgment is hereby granted with regard to Christopher Emerson. All right, title and interest in or to $37,200.00 U.S. currency of the defendant property held by Christopher Emerson is hereby forever barred and foreclosed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to defaulted defendant) (KMM) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Amend MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #11 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2019 regarding MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #11 . Mr. Emerson, who filed a claim in the administrative forfeiture but who has not filed a claim in this action, was not present. Motion will be granted; USA to submit revised proposed order. Hearing held in Omaha. Courtroom Deputy: Amy Brunswick; Reporter: Lisa Grimminger ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Amy Blackburn: Appearance for Defendant: None. Time Start: 10:58 AM; Time Stop: 11:06 AM; Time in Court: 8 Minutes. (ADB) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion regarding MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #11 . A Motion Hearing is set for 8/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon.Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to defaulted defendant)(TCL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant $37,200.00 in United States Currency (Christopher Emerson). Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to defendant) (KLF) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INDEX in support of MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #8 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #5 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WARRANT IN REM Issued. (LKO) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $37,200.00 in United States Currency, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.