This case was last updated from PACER on 04/28/2019 at 07:33:43 (UTC).

United States of America v. $32,000.00 in United States Currency

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 32,000 00 in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00962

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$32,000.00 in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael John Brown

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney-ATL600

600 United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Dr., S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 04/19/2019. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Warrant for Arrest In Rem filed by United States of America as to Defendant Currency. (ddm) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Robert Thurman (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Robert Thurman via Attorney Gabe Banks (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed on 3/15/2019 for $32000.00 United State Currency. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 6, 2019 through May 17, 2019, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 04/19/2019. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 6, 2019 through May 17, 2019, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed on 3/15/2019 for $32000.00 United State Currency. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Robert Thurman (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Robert Thurman via Attorney Gabe Banks (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Warrant for Arrest In Rem filed by United States of America as to Defendant Currency. (ddm) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.