This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2020 at 13:29:42 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 280 Salem Street, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against 280 Salem Street, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark L. Wolf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11321

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark L. Wolf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

ConAgra Grocery Products Company, LLC

NSTAR Electric Company d/b/a Eversource Energy

BASF Corporation

Pharmacia LLC

280 Salem Street, LLC

The Gillette Company

Murphy's Waste Oil Service, Inc.

W.R. Grace & Co. Conn.

Stepan Company

Cognis USA LLC

Varian Medical Systems, Inc.

Atos IT Solutions and Services, Inc.

Goulston Technologies, Inc.

OSRAM SYLVANIA, Inc.

The Sherwin-Williams Company

Organix, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Weigert

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station, Phb Room 2121

Washington, DC 20044-7611

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree for Public Comment

1 #4

Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree [Please do not enter, unless and until public co

1 #5

Appendix Appendices to Proposed Consent Decree

#3

#6

6 #1

Memorandum in Support of United States' Motion to Enter Consent Decree

6 #2

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment United States' Motion to Enter Consent Decree by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of United States' Motion to Enter Consent Decree, #2 Certificate of Service)(Weigert, David) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report no later than October 30, 2020.( Status Report due by 10/30/2020)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 10/13/2020. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree for Public Comment, #4 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree [Please do not enter, unless and until public comment period closes and US files motion to enter.], #5 Appendix Appendices to Proposed Consent Decree)(Weigert, David) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stepan Company is a litigant

Latest cases where NSTAR Electric Company d/b/a Eversource Energy is a litigant

Latest cases where COGNIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WR GRACE & CO is a litigant