This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:47:52 (UTC).

United States of America v. 276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 276 Payment Cards worth approximately 6,650 00. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey J. Helmick and James R. Knepp, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00666

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

Referral Judge

James R. Knepp, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Guillermo J. Rojas

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Toledo

3Rd Floor, 4 Seagate

Toledo, OH 43604

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Warrant of Arrest in Rem

#6

(#6) Marshal's Return of Warrant of Arrest in Rem executed on 4/4/2019 filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(M,L) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#5

(#5) Process receipt and return of warrant of Arrest in Rem executed upon 276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00 on 4/3/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Rojas, Guillermo) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (R,Ke). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

4 #1

Process Receipt and Return

#4

(#4) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for 276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00 issued to U.S. Marshal on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Process Receipt and Return) (D,TM) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Supplement to Complaint, - Process Receipt & Return for Warrant of Arrest in rem, filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Rojas, Guillermo) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Exhibit 1: List of Payment Cards re: Forfeiture Complaint filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 .(Rojas, Guillermo) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

1 #2

Warrant of Arrest in rem

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Verified Complaint in Forfeiture against 276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant of Arrest in rem) (Rojas, Guillermo) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Marshal's Return of Warrant of Arrest in Rem executed on 4/4/2019 filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(M,L) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Process receipt and return of warrant of Arrest in Rem executed upon 276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00 on 4/3/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Rojas, Guillermo) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (R,Ke). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for 276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00 issued to U.S. Marshal on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Process Receipt and Return) (D,TM) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplement to Complaint, - Process Receipt & Return for Warrant of Arrest in rem, filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Rojas, Guillermo) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 3/26/2019. (D,TM) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (D,TM) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Exhibit 1: List of Payment Cards re: Forfeiture Complaint filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 .(Rojas, Guillermo) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Verified Complaint in Forfeiture against 276 Payment Cards worth approximately $6,650.00. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant of Arrest in rem) (Rojas, Guillermo) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less