This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 07:58:03 (UTC).

United States of America v. $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 27,000 00 in U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$27,000.00 in U.S. Currency

Interested Party

Jermaine Woodson

Cleveland, OH 44113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henry F. DeBaggis, II

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Appendix B - Exhibit List

7 #1

Appendix A - Witness List

#7

(#7) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 02/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Pursuant to Rule 38(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Jermaine Woodson. (O'Neill, Mary) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Verified Claim Pursuant to Rule (G)(5) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions; Claimant's Demand for a Jury Trial Pursuant to Rule 38(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Jermaine Woodson. Related document(s) #1 .(O'Neill, Mary) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Jermaine Woodson on 1/22/2020, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (J,FE) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency on 1/28/2020. Asset was taken into custody on 11/21/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #2 . (L,MI) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

2 #1

USM-285 Receipt and Return

#2

(#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $27,000.00 US Currency issued to the U.S.Marshals on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Receipt and Return) (M,TL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #5

Notice to Potential Claimant

1 #4

USMS Process and Return

1 #3

Warrant of Arrest in Rem

1 #2

Praecipe

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint in Forfeiture against $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USMS Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (DeBaggis, Henry) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 02/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Pursuant to Rule 38(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Jermaine Woodson. (O'Neill, Mary) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Verified Claim Pursuant to Rule (G)(5) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions; Claimant's Demand for a Jury Trial Pursuant to Rule 38(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Jermaine Woodson. Related document(s) #1 .(O'Neill, Mary) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Jermaine Woodson on 1/22/2020, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (J,FE) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency on 1/28/2020. Asset was taken into custody on 11/21/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #2 . (L,MI) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketService by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Jermaine Woodson placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648639. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $27,000.00 US Currency issued to the U.S.Marshals on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Receipt and Return) (M,TL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketJudge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint in Forfeiture against $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USMS Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (DeBaggis, Henry) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less