This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2019 at 05:43:08 (UTC).

United States of America v. $26,000.00 U.S. Currency, et al.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug case was filed by United States of America against 26,000 00 U S Currency in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02592

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

$26,000.00 U.S. Currency

VIN: 1G6KD5EY2AU133719

Interested Party

Michael Lewis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James L. Morford

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Marshal's Return on Warrant of Arrest in Rem $26,000 USC was taken into USMS custody on 6/4/19 and Vehicle was taken into USMS custody on 6/12/19 filed by United States of America. (J,FE) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michael Lewis c/o Stanley T. Booker, Esq. on 11/8/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (J,FE) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

2 #1

USM-285

#2

(#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued to U.S. Marshal on 11/6/2019 for $26,000.00 U.S. Currency and VIN: 1G6KD5EY2AU133719. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,Ke) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

1 #5

Notice to Potential Claimant

1 #4

USMS Process and Return

1 #3

Warrant of Arrest in Rem

1 #2

Praecipe

1 #1

Civil Cover

#1

(#1) Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USMS Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Morford, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Marshal's Return on Warrant of Arrest in Rem $26,000 USC was taken into USMS custody on 6/4/19 and Vehicle was taken into USMS custody on 6/12/19 filed by United States of America. (J,FE) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michael Lewis c/o Stanley T. Booker, Esq. on 11/8/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (J,FE) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued to U.S. Marshal on 11/6/2019 for $26,000.00 U.S. Currency and VIN: 1G6KD5EY2AU133719. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,Ke) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Michael Lewis placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70140150000158886804. (B,R) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,R) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,R) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USMS Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Morford, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.