This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2020 at 07:45:05 (UTC).

United States of America v. $25,239.00 in U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 25,239 00 in U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00637

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$25,239.00 in U.S. Currency

Interested Party

Kevin Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Morford

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Henry F. DeBaggis, II

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Interested Party Attorney

Bret Jordan

1900 Terminal Tower, 50 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Plaintiff made initial disclosures on 4/14/2020. Discovery is due by 9/1/2020. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments are due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/1/2020. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/1/2020 at 01:30 PM. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/12/20. (W,RA) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#8

(#8) Minutes of proceedings. Telephonic Case Management Conference conducted. Separate Case Management Conference Order to be issued. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 20 Minutes. (W,RA) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

6 #1

Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard

#6

(#6) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/12/2020 at 01:30 PM to be held telephonically (Conference call instructions to be sent via email). IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(L,Ja) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy. (L,Ja) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Kevin Williams. (Jordan, Bret) Modified on 5/13/2020, no counterclaim filed (L,Ja). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

3 #1

Warrant of arrest in rem

2 #1

USM-285

#2

(#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $25,239.00 in U.S. Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 3/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (B,R) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

1 #5

Notice to Potential Claimant

1 #4

USM-285 - Warrant of Arrest in Rem

1 #3

Warrant of Arrest in Rem

1 #2

Praecipe

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Service of Plaintiff United States of America's Interrogatories and Document Request to Claimant Williams via email filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Plaintiff made initial disclosures on 4/14/2020. Discovery is due by 9/1/2020. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments are due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/1/2020. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/1/2020 at 01:30 PM. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/12/20. (W,RA) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minutes of proceedings. Telephonic Case Management Conference conducted. Separate Case Management Conference Order to be issued. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 20 Minutes. (W,RA) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIMPORTANT CHANGE IN TIME ONLY: Notice [non-document] Case Management Conference to be held on 5/12/2020 at 3:00 PM to be held telephonically. Conference call instructions remain the same. Related document(s) #6 . (L,Ja) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Discovery Plan) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/12/2020 at 01:30 PM to be held telephonically (Conference call instructions to be sent via email). IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(L,Ja) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy. (L,Ja) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Kevin Williams. (Jordan, Bret) Modified on 5/13/2020, no counterclaim filed (L,Ja). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Marshal's Return. $25,239.00 USC taken into USMS custody on 10/17/2019. Related document(s) #2 . (Attachments: #1 Warrant of arrest in rem)(S,SR) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $25,239.00 in U.S. Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 3/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (B,R) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketJudge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint in Forfeiture against $25,239.00 in U.S. Currency. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USM-285 - Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (DeBaggis, Henry) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less