This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2019 at 07:36:13 (UTC).

United States of America v. 24,887.48 dollars in United States Currency

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 24,887 48 dollars in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary Geiger Lewis and Paige J Gossett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01758

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

Referral Judge

Paige J Gossett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

William Edward Tillman

Columbia, SC 29210

Defendants

24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency

24,887.48 dollars in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrie Fisher Sherard

Attorney at US Attorneys Office (Gville)

55 Beattie Place, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Envelope

#22

(#22) CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

20 #1

Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report

#20

(#20) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 7/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

18 #2

Envelope

18 #1

Cover Letter

#18

(#18) CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (bgoo) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#16

(#16) WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (bgoo) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#15

(#15) APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (Sherard, Carrie) (Main Document 15 replaced on 8/1/2019 with corrected document provided by filing user.) (bgoo) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/28/2019 (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

9 #3

Envelope

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Cover Letter from US Attorney's Office

#9

(#9) CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter from US Attorney's Office, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sherard, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 proposed Amended Complaint) (cbru, ). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 7/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (bgoo) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Warrant In Rem Issued placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to William Edward Tillman, 268523, Kirkland Correctional Institution, 4344 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210 (bgoo) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (bgoo) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (Sherard, Carrie) (Main Document 15 replaced on 8/1/2019 with corrected document provided by filing user.) (bgoo) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/28/2019 (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter from US Attorney's Office, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/29/2019.(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sherard, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 proposed Amended Complaint) (cbru, ). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WARRANT Returned as to 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency . (Attachments: #1 Warrant in rem with Return)(Sherard, Carrie) Modified to edit text on 6/26/2019 (cbru, ). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (cbru, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (cbru, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Agent Julie Yelk)(cbru, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less