This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2019 at 07:57:37 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug case was filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against 20,000 00, more or less, in U S Currency in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00744

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

Presiding Judge

William H. Steele

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Counter Claimant and Claimant

Juan Ignacio Garcia

Defendants and Counter Defendants

$20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

63 S. Royal St., Rm. 600

Mobile, AL 36602

Counter Claimant and Claimant Attorney

Kyle Jordan Henderson

Attorney at Kyle J. Henderson, Attorney at Law, LLC

8319 Spanish Fort Blvd. Suite B, Al

Spanish Fort, AL 36527

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Consent Form

#7

(#7) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Juan Ignacio Garcia ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against $20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by Juan Ignacio Garcia. (Henderson, Kyle) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#5

(#5) CLAIM Forfeiture by $20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency. (Henderson, Kyle) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Proof of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Last publication date November 6, 2019. (Heisterhagen, Kasee) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 10/16/19 - Process Receipt and Return for Warrant for Arrest Acknowledgement filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Heisterhagen, Kasee) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

1 #3

Warrant for Arrest

1 #2

Notice of Forfeiture Action

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Forfeiture Action, #3 Warrant for Arrest) (Heisterhagen, Kasee) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Juan Ignacio Garcia ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against $20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by Juan Ignacio Garcia. (Henderson, Kyle) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLAIM Forfeiture by $20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency. (Henderson, Kyle) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proof of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Last publication date November 6, 2019. (Heisterhagen, Kasee) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 10/16/19 - Process Receipt and Return for Warrant for Arrest Acknowledgement filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Heisterhagen, Kasee) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $20,000.00, more or less, in U.S. Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Forfeiture Action, #3 Warrant for Arrest) (Heisterhagen, Kasee) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.