This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2019 at 08:13:41 (UTC).

United States of America v. 1.54 Acres, More or Less, Located in Hancock County, State of Mississippi et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 United States of America filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 1 54 Acres, More or Less, Located in Hancock County, State of Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00575

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.

1.54 Acres, More or Less, Located in Hancock County, State of Mississippi

Hancock County, Mississippi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Miles Hampson Plant-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

Emily S. Nobile-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Gulfport

1575 20Th Avenue

Gulfport, MS 39501

Devin A. Wolak-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Devin A. Wolak-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Wolak-Federal Gov, Devin) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for an expedited order vesting in plaintiff the right to immediate possession of the condemned property. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 9/25/2019. (BR) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION Unopposed Motion for an Expedited Order Vesting in Plaintiff the Right to Immediate Possession of the Property filed by United States of America (Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION Unopposed Motion for an Expedited Order Vesting in Plaintiff the Right to Immediate Possession of the Property by United States of America (Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Deposit Funds in Court's Registry. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 9/19/2019. (BR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

4 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Deposit Funds into an Interest-Bearing Account in the Court's Registry by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

3 #7

Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties

3 #6

Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation

3 #5

Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken

3 #4

Exhibit Schedule D - Map

3 #3

Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description

3 #2

Exhibit Schedule B -

3 #1

Exhibit Schedule A - Authority

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Condemnation by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B -, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Devin A. Wolak-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Wolak-Federal Gov, Devin) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10: (1) Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.), and (2) Based on the title of the document, the event code Substitute Attorney should have been used. Attorney is not required to refile. (RLW) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Miles Hampson Plant-Federal Gov terminated. Attorney Devin A. Wolak is permitted to make an entry of appearance on behalf of the United States of America. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 18, 2019 (King, Steve) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for an expedited order vesting in plaintiff the right to immediate possession of the condemned property. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 9/25/2019. (BR) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION Unopposed Motion for an Expedited Order Vesting in Plaintiff the Right to Immediate Possession of the Property filed by United States of America (Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION Unopposed Motion for an Expedited Order Vesting in Plaintiff the Right to Immediate Possession of the Property by United States of America (Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • $2,300 paid into court registry, receipt # 14643011696. Copy of receipt, order, and check sent to finance department. (JCH) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Deposit Funds in Court's Registry. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 9/19/2019. (BR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 4. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Deposit Funds into an Interest-Bearing Account in the Court's Registry by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Condemnation by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B -, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE Declaration of Taking by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant-Federal Gov, Miles) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 1.54 Acres, More or Less, Located in Hancock County, State of Mississippi, Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Hancock County, Mississippi, filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #3 Schedule A - Authority for Takin, #4 Schedule B - Public Purpose, #5 Schedule C - Legal Description of Property, #6 Schedule D - Plat, #7 Schedule E - Estate Taken, #8 Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #9 Schedule G - Interested Parties) (RLW). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hancock County, Mississippi is a litigant

Latest cases where Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miles Hampson Plant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Devin Andrew Wolak