This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:48:13 (UTC).

United States of America v. $144,975.00 United States Currency et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 144,975 00 United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank P. Geraci, Jr. and Marian W. Payson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06232

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

Referral Judge

Marian W. Payson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

And Escalera

Defendants

$144,975.00 United States Currency

$8,500.00 United States Currency

One 2010 Mercedes Benz Bearing VIN: WDDJF8HBXAA128110

One 2010 Mercedes Benz 350 Bearing VIN: WDDHF8HBXAA128110

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grace M. Carducci

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

100 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Defendant and Claimant Attorney

Michael Patrick Schiano

Attorney at The Schiano Law Office

315 Wilder Building, One East Main Street

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by $144,975.00 United States Currency, $8,500.00 United States Currency, One 2010 Mercedes Benz 350 Bearing VIN: WDDHF8HBXAA128110. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Schiano, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

6 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against $144,975.00 United States Currency, $8,500.00 United States Currency, One 2010 Mercedes Benz Bearing VIN: WDDJF8HBXAA128110, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrants In Rem)(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#4

(#4) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date April 27, 2019. (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property/Arrest warrant in rem Issued (TF) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#3

(#3) ARREST WARRANTS in rem Returned executed (TF) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #2

Arrest Warrants In Rem

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Hon. Marian W. Payson, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the Magistrate Judge's chambers or the Clerk of Court's office. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/2/19. (JO) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by $144,975.00 United States Currency, $8,500.00 United States Currency, One 2010 Mercedes Benz 350 Bearing VIN: WDDHF8HBXAA128110. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Schiano, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date April 27, 2019. (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ARREST WARRANTS in rem Returned executed (TF) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property/Arrest warrant in rem Issued (TF) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against $144,975.00 United States Currency, $8,500.00 United States Currency, One 2010 Mercedes Benz Bearing VIN: WDDJF8HBXAA128110, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrants In Rem)(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.