This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:45:42 (UTC).

United States of America v. $142,351 United States Currency

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 142,351 United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00235

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

Alexis Ann Haynes

Defendant

$142,351 United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Debra Teufel Phillips

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Nashville Office)

110 Ninth Avenue, S, Suite A961

Nashville, TN 37203-3870

Claimant Attorneys

Edward M. Burch

Attorney at Law Office of Michael & Burch, LLP

One Sansome Street, Suite 3500

San Francisco, CA 94104

David M. Michael

Attorney at Law Offices of David M. Michael

One Sansome Street, Suite 3500

San Francisco, CA 94104

John G. Oliva

1308 Rosa L. Parks Blvd.

Nashville, TN 37208

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) RETURN OF SERVICE by USM re #14 Order issued by the Court. (dt) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, ENTRY OF CONSENT FORFEITURE JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/4/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

13 #2

Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release

13 #1

Attachment proposed Order Approving Settlement Agreement, Entry of Consent Forfe

#13

(#13) MOTION for Settlement Agreement, Entry of Consent Forfeiture Judgment and Dimissal of Action by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order Approving Settlement Agreement, Entry of Consent Forfeiture Judgment and Dimissal of Action, #2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release)(Phillips, Debra) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Edward M. Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 5/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dt). (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR D.E. 10 filed by United States of America re #10 Notice of Settlement filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Debra) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement NOTICE OF TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT by United States of America (Phillips, Debra) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#9

(#9) RECEIPT #34675054857 in the amount of $100.00 posted by Edward M. Burch re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS returned executed re: $142,351 United States Currency served on 3/29/2019. Served Verified Complaint and Warrant for Arrest in rem to the file according to law. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Warrant of Arrest in rem by United States of America. (dt) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

1 #5

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Grimes Instagram

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Grimes Haynes Instagram

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Waiver GK-19-0003

1 #1

Attachment - Affidavit of Matthew Moore

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $142,351 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Affidavit of Matthew Moore, #2 Exhibit 1 - Waiver GK-19-0003, #3 Exhibit 2 - Grimes Haynes Instagram, #4 Exhibit 3 - Grimes Instagram, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 3/19/2019 (dt). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RETURN OF SERVICE by USM re #14 Order issued by the Court. (dt) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, ENTRY OF CONSENT FORFEITURE JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/4/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Settlement Agreement, Entry of Consent Forfeiture Judgment and Dimissal of Action by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order Approving Settlement Agreement, Entry of Consent Forfeiture Judgment and Dimissal of Action, #2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release)(Phillips, Debra) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Edward M. Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 5/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dt). (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR D.E. 10 filed by United States of America re #10 Notice of Settlement filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Debra) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Settlement NOTICE OF TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT by United States of America (Phillips, Debra) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RECEIPT #34675054857 in the amount of $100.00 posted by Edward M. Burch re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for John G. Oliva. (dt) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Oliva on behalf of Alexis Ann Haynes (Oliva, John) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • CA State Bar status verified as active for David M. Michael. (dt) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLAIM filed by Alexis Ann Haynes Opposing Forfeiture by Alexis Ann Haynes. (Michael, David) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward M. Burch: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 5/15/2019. (dt) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • CA State Bar status verified as active for Edward M. Burch. (dt) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for attorney Edward M. Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Alexis Ann Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(dt) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS returned executed re: $142,351 United States Currency served on 3/29/2019. Served Verified Complaint and Warrant for Arrest in rem to the file according to law. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Debra Teufel Phillips. (dt) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons and Warrant for Arrest in Rem on Defendant Property, issued by the Clerk. (dt) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Warrant of Arrest in rem by United States of America. (dt) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $142,351 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Affidavit of Matthew Moore, #2 Exhibit 1 - Waiver GK-19-0003, #3 Exhibit 2 - Grimes Haynes Instagram, #4 Exhibit 3 - Grimes Instagram, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 3/19/2019 (dt). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less