Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/19/2021 at 11:00:36 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 0.643 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 0 643 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Micaela Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00426

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Micaela Alvarez

 

Party Details

Defendants

Guadalupe Soliz, Jr.

Maria Magdalena Escobar

Tomas Molina

David Molina

Rolando Molina

Vern Vanderpool

Rodolfo Sandoval

Olga O. Molina Escobar

Yolanda M. Belmontes

Aaron Sandoval, Jr.

Martin H. Molina

Jose Trinidad Molina

Iliana Molina

Jaime Joel Sandoval

Ricardo Sandoval

Eliza Nelly Molina

Myrna Elena Rodriguez

0.643 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS

Orfelinda Molina Menchaca

Dina Scott

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Roy R Brandys

Attorney at Barron, Adler, Clough & Oddo, LLP

808 Nueces St

Austin, TX 78701

Other Attorneys

Manuel Muniz Lorenzi

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1701 W Hwy 83, Suite 600

Mcallen, TX 78501

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yolanda M. Belmontes served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Maria Magdalena Escobar served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Alma Nora Ibarra served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; David Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Eliza Nelly Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Iliana Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Jose Trinidad Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Juan Abel Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Marilu Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Tomas Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rolando Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Olga O. Molina Escobar served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Orfelinda Molina Menchaca served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rene Molina, Jr. served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rodolfo R. Molina, Jr. served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Myrna Elena Rodriguez served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Jaime Joel Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Juan Luis Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Ricardo Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rodolfo Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Aaron Sandoval, Jr. served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Dina Scott served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Martha Irene Young served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ameida Salinas, Starr County Tax Assessor-Collector served on 1/20/2020, answer due 3/20/2020, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rolando Molina, Olga O. Molina Escobar, Orfelinda Molina Menchaca, Rene Molina, Jr., filed.(Brandys, Roy) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#6

(#6) Clerk's Receipt, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vern Vanderpool served on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit SCHEDULES TO NOTICE

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCHEDULES TO NOTICE)(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit SCHEDULES TO DT

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCHEDULES TO DT)(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Schedules to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yolanda M. Belmontes served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Maria Magdalena Escobar served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Alma Nora Ibarra served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; David Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Eliza Nelly Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Iliana Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Jose Trinidad Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Juan Abel Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Marilu Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Tomas Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rolando Molina served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Olga O. Molina Escobar served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Orfelinda Molina Menchaca served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rene Molina, Jr. served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rodolfo R. Molina, Jr. served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Myrna Elena Rodriguez served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Jaime Joel Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Juan Luis Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Ricardo Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Rodolfo Sandoval served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Aaron Sandoval, Jr. served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Dina Scott served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Martha Irene Young served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ameida Salinas, Starr County Tax Assessor-Collector served on 1/20/2020, answer due 3/20/2020, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rolando Molina, Olga O. Molina Escobar, Orfelinda Molina Menchaca, Rene Molina, Jr., filed.(Brandys, Roy) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDeposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $6,000.00, receipt number 21-00201, filed. (knguyen, 4) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's Receipt, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vern Vanderpool served on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCHEDULES TO NOTICE)(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCHEDULES TO DT)(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lorenzi, Manuel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manuel Muniz Lorenzi