This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2020 at 08:04:43 (UTC).

United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and William E. Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00668

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc.

Defendants

Federal Insurance Company

Brican, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

R. Thomas Dunn

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

One Financial Plaza, 26Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Katharine E. Kohm

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

One Financial Plaza, 26Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. of Voluntary Dismissal (Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

6 #4

Exhibit 4

6 #3

Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. upon Brican, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

5 #5

Exhibit 5

5 #4

Exhibit 4

5 #3

Exhibit 3

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. Federal Insurance Company served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Brican, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER Entering #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/4/2020. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. of Voluntary Dismissal (Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. upon Brican, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. Federal Insurance Company served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Brican, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1459927 ), filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Brican, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1459927 ), filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kohm, Katharine) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less