This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2021 at 09:40:34 (UTC).

United States of America et al v. Holcim (US) Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 United States of America filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Holcim US Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Glenn T. Suddaby and Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glenn T. Suddaby

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of New York

United States of America

Defendant

Holcim (US) Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph M. Kowalczyk

Attorney at New York State Attorney General - Albany

John D. Hoggan, Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice - Albany Office

445 Broadway, Room 218, James T. Foley Courthouse

Albany, NY 12207-2924

Defendant Attorney

Richard T. Marooney, Jr.

Attorney at King, Spalding Law Firm - NY Office

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-4003

 

Court Documents

7 #5

Certificate of Good Standing

7 #4

E-Filing Registration Form and Oath of Admission

7 #3

Petition for Admission

7 #2

Declaration of Sponsor

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam G. Sowatzka Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5564034. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 E-Filing Registration Form and Oath of Admission, #5 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Marooney, Richard) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendant Holcim (US) Inc.; Attorney Adam G. Sowatzka, Esq., Email address is asowatzka@kslaw.com. Phone number is 404-572-4600. Admissions due by 6/30/2021. {Copy sent to Attorney Sowatzka by email} (jmb) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T. Marooney, Jr on behalf of Holcim (US) Inc. (Marooney, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#4

(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Holcim (US) Inc. (jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

2 #1

Proposed Consent Decree

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE: filed by United States of America and State of New York regarding the #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT: against Holcim (US) Inc. filed by United States of America and State of New York. Filing Fee Waived. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam G. Sowatzka is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Defendant. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 6/25/2021. (mab) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam G. Sowatzka Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5564034. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 E-Filing Registration Form and Oath of Admission, #5 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Marooney, Richard) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendant Holcim (US) Inc.; Attorney Adam G. Sowatzka, Esq., Email address is asowatzka@kslaw.com. Phone number is 404-572-4600. Admissions due by 6/30/2021. {Copy sent to Attorney Sowatzka by email} (jmb) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T. Marooney, Jr on behalf of Holcim (US) Inc. (Marooney, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Holcim (US) Inc. (jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE: filed by United States of America and State of New York regarding the #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT: against Holcim (US) Inc. filed by United States of America and State of New York. Filing Fee Waived. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holcim (US) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Hoggan, Jr.