This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:13 (UTC).

United States Liability Insurance Company v. Nunez et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 United States Liability Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nunez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03354

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States Liability Insurance Company

Defendants

Kikas Construction, Inc.

Lucy Ontiveros

Jorge Ontiveros

Manuel Nunez

Little Explorers Learning Center, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott D Hofer

Attorney at Foland, Wickens, Eisfelder, Roper & Hofer, P.C.

1200 Main Street, 22Nd Floor

Kansas City, MO 64105

AUSA - Chicago

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

William Francis Logan

Attorney at Foland, Wickens, Roper, Hofer & Crawford, PC

1200 Main St., Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64105

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B - Policy CL 1719379

1 #1

Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15903144. (Logan, William) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by United States Liability Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Policy CL 1719379)(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff United States Liability Insurance Company to continue Initial Status Conference (Logan, William) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Plaintiff's uncontested motion for continuance of initial status conference #9 is granted. Status hearing set for 7/16/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the hearing will be stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/16/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/9/2019. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Motion by William F. Logan for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States Liability Insurance Company by Scott D Hofer (Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Plaintiff's uncontested motion for continuance of initial status conference #9 is granted. Status hearing set for 7/16/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the hearing will be stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiff United States Liability Insurance Company to continue Initial Status Conference (Logan, William) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Motion by William F. Logan for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15903144. (Logan, William) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/16/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/9/2019. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States Liability Insurance Company by Scott D Hofer (Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PAYMENT regarding #1 of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840302. (Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by United States Liability Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Policy CL 1719379)(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.