This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:07:18 (UTC).

United States Department of Labor v. Ben Shinn Trucking, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 United States Department of Labor filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Ben Shinn Trucking, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00372

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States Department of Labor

Defendants

Roger Shinn

Shinn 401(k) Retirement Plan

Ben Shinn Trucking, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Usha R Smerdon

Attorney at U S DEPT OF LABOR OFFICE OF SOLICITOR

Two Pershing Square Bldg, 2300 Main Street, Suite 1020

Kansas City, MO 64108

Austin Case

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF LABOR-MO

2300 Main Street, Suite 1020

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Department of Labor; Roger Shinn waiver served on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Case, Austin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Department of Labor; Shinn 401(k) Retirement Plan waiver served on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Case, Austin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Department of Labor; Ben Shinn Trucking, Inc. waiver served on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Case, Austin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Case on behalf of United States Department of Labor (Case, Austin) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eugene Scalia. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/18/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smerdon, Usha) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Department of Labor; Roger Shinn waiver served on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Case, Austin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Department of Labor; Shinn 401(k) Retirement Plan waiver served on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Case, Austin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Department of Labor; Ben Shinn Trucking, Inc. waiver served on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Case, Austin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Case on behalf of United States Department of Labor (Case, Austin) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eugene Scalia. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/18/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smerdon, Usha) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant