This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 10:02:39 (UTC).

United Service Automobile Association v. M1 Support Services, LP et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 United Service Automobile Association filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against M1 Support Services, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Russ Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Russ Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Service Automobile Association

Defendants

M1 Support Services, LP

Danny Floyd Payne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zack Michael Azar

Defendant Attorneys

Clinton Timothy Speegle

Rachel McCulley Lary

M. Wesley Smithart

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Exhibit Ex A Motion to Consolidate

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (bes, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTs) M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne. (bes, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Timothy Speegle on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne (Speegle, Clinton) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by M1 Support Services, LP. (Smithart, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Danny Floyd Payne. (Smithart, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with jury demand by M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne.(Smithart, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United Service Automobile Association re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement . (Azar, Zack) Modified on 11/4/2021 to add the link to the #3 Notice(bes, ). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#5

(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for M1 Support Services, LP and Danny Floyd Payne served on (no date provided), answer due 11/12/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

3 #1

Standing Order and Sample Format

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) United Service Automobile Association. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

1 #2

Receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Motion to Consolidate)(Smithart, M.) Modified on 11/10/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (bes, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTs) M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne. (bes, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Timothy Speegle on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne (Speegle, Clinton) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Rachel McCulley Lary and Clinton Timothy Speegle for M1 Support Services, LP and Danny Floyd Payne added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by M1 Support Services, LP. (Smithart, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Danny Floyd Payne. (Smithart, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with jury demand by M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne.(Smithart, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United Service Automobile Association re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement . (Azar, Zack) Modified on 11/4/2021 to add the link to the #3 Notice(bes, ). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for M1 Support Services, LP and Danny Floyd Payne served on (no date provided), answer due 11/12/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to United Service Automobile Association; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) United Service Automobile Association. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064914.), filed by United Service Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less