This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 09:53:57 (UTC).

United Specialty Insurance Company v. First Mercury Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 United Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First Mercury Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01359

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

First Mercury Insurance Company

Clarendon National Insurance Company

Country Mutual Insurance Company

Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay Richard Graif

Jennifer C. Kalvestran

Defendant Attorneys

William James Kelly, III

Chanda Marie Feldkamp

 

Court Documents

34 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#34

#33

#31

28 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#28

#25

12 #1

Summons Amended Summons

#12

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #34 Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company's Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint until 8/3/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/09/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Feldkamp, Chanda) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Amtrust North America, Inc. by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company (Kalvestran, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #31 Amtrust North America, Inc.'s Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint until 7/9/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/29/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #25 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint by Defendant Amtrust North America, Inc.. (Schneider, Laura) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER Because not all Defendants have yet appeared in this matter, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2020 09:15 AM is VACATED and RESET For 8/25/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form on or before 8/11/2020, and shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 8/18/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/28/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 06/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #28 Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint until 7/13/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/26/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Feldkamp, Chanda) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Addison Insurance Company by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company (Kalvestran, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer C. Kalvestran on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jennifer C. Kalvestran added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Kalvestran, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Addison Insurance Company served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Amtrust North America, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Country Mutual Insurance Company served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/16/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/9/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/14/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Jay Richard Graif. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Company for United Specialty Insurance Company. (Graif, Jay) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Addison Insurance Company, Amtrust North America, Inc., Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7293688)Attorney Jay Richard Graif added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graif, Jay) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less