This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2021 at 09:49:39 (UTC).

United Services Automobile Association vs PNC Bank N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 United Services Automobile Association filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PNC Bank N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00246

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Services Automobile Association

Defendant

PNC Bank N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker Bunt & Ainsworth

100 E Ferguson, Suite 418

Tyler, TX 75702

Lisa Sharrock Glasser

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Newport Beach

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Rebecca L. Carson

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Newport Beach

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Adam R Lawton

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Blanca F Young

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson - San Francisco

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Eric P Tuttle

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Grant A Davis-Denny

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Gregory P Stone

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Marianna Y Mao

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson - San Francisco

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Peter A Detre

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson - San Francisco

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Peter E Gratzinger

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Rowley Rice

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Sarah S Lee

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Vincent Y Ling

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP - LA

350 S Grande Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

 

Court Documents

#34

#33

#32

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

31 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#31

#30

29 #8

Exhibit 5 to Glasser Declaration

29 #6

Exhibit 3 to Glasser Declaration

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REDACTION to #32 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by United Services Automobile Association. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REDACTION to #26 Sealed Response to Motion,, by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Morris Declaration, #2 Affidavit Wright Declaration, #3 Affidavit Glasser Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 to Glasser Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Glasser Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Glasser Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Glasser Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Glasser Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Glasser Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Glasser Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Glasser Declaration, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Morris Declaration, #2 Wright Declaration, #3 Glasser Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 to Glasser Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Glasser Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Glasser Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Glasser Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Glasser Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Glasser Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Glasser Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Glasser Declaration, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Blanca F Young on behalf of PNC Bank N.A.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8514262. (Young, Blanca) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PNC Bank N.A. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by PNC Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Services Automobile Association. PNC Bank N.A. served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to PNC Bank N.A. by and through its Registered Agent Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Services Automobile Association (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against PNC Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8484641.), filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marianna Yuling Mao

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blanca Young