This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:46:15 (UTC).

United Services Automobile Association v. PNC Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 United Services Automobile Association filed an Other lawsuit against PNC Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Services Automobile Association

Defendant

PNC Bank N.A.

In Re

Jason L. Gray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason G Sheasby

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Lisa Sharrock Glasser

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Newport Beach

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker Bunt & Ainsworth

100 E Ferguson, Suite 418

Tyler, TX 75702

Stephen M Payne

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Newport Beach

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

In Re Attorneys

Brian E Mack

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Eiseman, IV

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jonathan S Tse

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen M Payne on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8898273. (Payne, Stephen) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jason G Sheasby on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8898260. (Sheasby, Jason) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Sharrock Glasser on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8898241. (Glasser, Lisa) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER re 1 Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Jason L. Gray. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/2/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2022)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00569. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/29/2022)

6 #1

Transfer Order

#6

(#6) Case transferred to Eastern District of Texas. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Texas*.*100 East Houston Street Room 125**Marshall, Texas 75670*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 4/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (fth) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by United Services Automobile Association (Glasser, Lisa) QC Mailer - Attorney Not Associated with Party (fth). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Services Automobile Association. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Glasser, Lisa) QC Mailer - Attorney Not Associated with Party (fth). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#3

(#3) RESPONSE to Motion re 1 MOTION to Quash Notice of Non-Opposition to Transfer to Eastern District of Texas and Request for Immediate Transfer filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Glasser, Lisa) QC Mailer - Attorney Not Associated with Party (fth). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#2

(#2) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. On or before May 13, 2022, United Services Automobile Association must file either an opposition addressing only whether Gray's Motion should be transferred to the Eastern District of Texas or a notice of non-opposition to such transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 4/27/2022.(fth) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

1 #7

Proof of Service

1 #6

Exhibit 3

1 #5

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Quash

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen M Payne on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8898273. (Payne, Stephen) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jason G Sheasby on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8898260. (Sheasby, Jason) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Sharrock Glasser on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8898241. (Glasser, Lisa) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re 1 Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Jason L. Gray. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/2/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1 filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Payne, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00569. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred to Eastern District of Texas. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Texas*.*100 East Houston Street Room 125**Marshall, Texas 75670*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 4/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (fth) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by United Services Automobile Association (Glasser, Lisa) QC Mailer - Attorney Not Associated with Party (fth). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Services Automobile Association. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Glasser, Lisa) QC Mailer - Attorney Not Associated with Party (fth). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RESPONSE to Motion re 1 MOTION to Quash Notice of Non-Opposition to Transfer to Eastern District of Texas and Request for Immediate Transfer filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Glasser, Lisa) QC Mailer - Attorney Not Associated with Party (fth). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. On or before May 13, 2022, United Services Automobile Association must file either an opposition addressing only whether Gray's Motion should be transferred to the Eastern District of Texas or a notice of non-opposition to such transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 4/27/2022.(fth) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO QUASH OUT OF DISTRICT SUBPOENA by Jason L. Gray. (no document attached) (ggv) Modified on 4/25/2022 (ggv). (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO QUASH OUT OF DISTRICT SUBPOENA against PNC Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16765016.), filed by Jason L. Gray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Quash, #3 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:22-cv-569-TWR-DEB. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(ggv) Modified on 4/25/2022 (ggv). (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/29/2022.] (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Payne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa S Glasser