Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:46:16 (UTC).

UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. v. LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA , INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley R. Chesler and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17169

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley R. Chesler

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THERESA A. GUERTIN

Attorney at SAXE DOERNBERGER & VITA PC

1952 Whitney Avenue

Hamden, CT 06517

Defendant Attorney

DEBORAH ANN BRYANT

Attorney at JAFFE & ASHER LLP

80 E. Ridgewood Avenue, Suite 301

Paramus, NJ 07652

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying liberty Mutual Group as Corporate Parent.. (BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH ANN BRYANT on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Deft. Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co... (BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company via NJDOBI on August 29, 2019, filed by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (GUERTIN, THERESA) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. identifying United Rentals, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GUERTIN, THERESA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - O'Keefe Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Fritz Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916682) with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fritz Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - O'Keefe Complaint)(GUERTIN, THERESA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 11/19/19 at 10am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/7/19. (tjg, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying liberty Mutual Group as Corporate Parent.. (BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH ANN BRYANT on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/3/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Deft. Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co... (BRYANT, DEBORAH) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company via NJDOBI on August 29, 2019, filed by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (GUERTIN, THERESA) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. identifying United Rentals, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GUERTIN, THERESA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916682) with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fritz Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - O'Keefe Complaint)(GUERTIN, THERESA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Rentals, Inc, is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theresa A. Guertin(Designation Retained)