This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 07:50:30 (UTC).

United Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 United Property Casualty Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-NuTone LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel Kelley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11739

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Angel Kelley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendant

Broan-NuTone LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erick J. Kirker

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Patrick J. Loftus, III

Attorney at Loftus & LoftusPC

The Coyne Building732 East Broadway

South Boston, MA 02124

Defendant Attorney

Christopher A. Duggan

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Action Cover Sheet

1 #3

Category Form

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • Docket(#9) District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Erick J. Kirker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erick Kirker Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9108913 by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good standing)(Loftus, Patrick) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference:The parties are invited to consult and submit an agreed-upon pretrial schedule as per the attached sample. If the Court finds parties' proposed deadlines reasonable or requires only minor adjustments, it may enter a scheduling order in lieu of holding the scheduling conference. Otherwise, Scheduling Conference is set for 2/8/2022 2:30 PM in Courtroom 8 (In person only) before District Judge Angel Kelley. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT Record. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC.. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broan-NuTone LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9026286 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Duggan