This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 07:07:07 (UTC).

United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 United HealthCare Services, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-02710

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Healthcare Services Inc

Defendants

Lupin Ltd.

Roxane Laboratories, Inc.

Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc

PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc

Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth V Kniffen

Heather T. Rankie

Anjalee Meren Behti

Eric W. Buetzow

James Robertson Martin

Judith A. Zahid

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - C

#2

2 #1

Exhibit(s) A and B

#3

#5

#6

#8

#9

9 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Case United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc et al, 21-cv-00737 has been transferred from the District of Minnesota to the Northern District of California pursuant Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) and assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. We have given this action the individual case number 5:21-cv-02710-LHK.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00737. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. (lmb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#7) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hamish P.M. Hume, Edward H. Takashima, Judith A. Zahid, Eric W. Buetzow, James R. Martin, Jennifer Duncan Hackett, John A. Carriel as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KDS) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (KDS) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals plc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (KDS) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-737 NEB/DTS. (KDS) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Kniffen, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals plc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc. filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B) (Kniffen, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8610620) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - C) (Kniffen, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less