This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2021 at 11:07:29 (UTC).

United Food & Commercial Workers Union-Employer Pension Fund, and its Trustees v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 United Food Commercial Workers Union-Employer Pension Fund, and its Trustees filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allianz Global Investors U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09587

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United Food & Commercial Workers Union-Employer Pension Fund, and its Trustees

Robert O'Toole

William R. Seehafer

Brian Jordan

Marc Parker

Mark Jacobs

Paul Schaefer

Defendants

Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.

PFP Holdings Inc.

Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.

Allianz of America, Inc., a subsidiary Allianz S.E., Munich, Germany

Allianz SE (Munich, Germany)

Allianz Asset Management GmbH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Silver Brooks

Attorney at Guttman, Buschner & Brooks, PLLC

4100Vpowelton Avenue

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Jonathan D Karmel

Attorney at The Karmel Law Firm

221 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1307

Chicago, IL 60601

Reuben Andrew Guttman

Attorney at Guttman, Buschner & Brooks PLLC (DC)

2000 P Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036

Mark J. Tamblyn

Attorney at Wexler Wallace LLP

333 University Ave, Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner

Attorney at Guttman, Buschner & Brooks PLLC

41-30 46Th Street

Sunnyside, NY 11104

Kenneth A. Wexler

Attorney at Wexler Toriseva Wallace LLP

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Kathleen Suzanne McArthur

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Hilary M. Williams

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Stephanie G Wheeler

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Mary Elizabeth Brust

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (NYC)

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Amy D. Roy

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston

Boston, MA 02199

Cole A Goodman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Robert A. Skinner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199

 

Court Documents

#29

No Description Available

#53

(#40) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... This confidentiality agreement does not bind the Court or any of its personnel. The Court can modify this stipulation at any time. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the terms and conditions of this agreement only for the pendency of this litigation. Any party wishing to make redacted or sealed submissions shall comply with Rule 6(A) of this Court's Individual Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, 20-cv-8642, 20-cv-9478, 20-cv-9479, 20-cv-9587, and 20-cv-10028. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

42 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#37

(#37) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #39) - PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE (Munich, Germany), PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#36

(#36) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #38) - PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE (Munich, Germany), PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#35

(#35) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#34

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order

15 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#14

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#53

No Description Available

#52

No Description Available

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Justin Silver Brooks to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Civil Cover Sheet consists of two pages. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (sj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF REUBEN A. GUTTMAN granting #42 Motion for Reuben A. Guttman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 42. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/11/21) (yv) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Reuben A. Guttman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23422005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION for Reuben A. Guttman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23422005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mark Jacobs, Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Marc Parker, Paul Schaefer, William R. Seehafer, United Food & Commercial Workers Union-Employer Pension Fund, and its Trustees. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Guttman, Reuben) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ESI PROTOCOL: The parties ("Parties") in the above-captioned actions ("Related Actions") have agreed to the terms of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding ESI Protocol ("ESI Protocol") to govern the form of productions made by the Parties. Accordingly, it is ORDERED: Absent special circumstances, the specifications set forth in this ESI Protocol shall govern the production of all documents and electronically stored information ("ESI") by the Parties during discovery in the Related Actions and further set forth in this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, 20-cv-8642, 20-cv-9478, 20-cv-9479, 20-cv-9587, and 20-cv-10028. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... This confidentiality agreement does not bind the Court or any of its personnel. The Court can modify this stipulation at any time. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the terms and conditions of this agreement only for the pendency of this litigation. Any party wishing to make redacted or sealed submissions shall comply with Rule 6(A) of this Court's Individual Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, 20-cv-8642, 20-cv-9478, 20-cv-9479, 20-cv-9587, and 20-cv-10028. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #39) - PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE (Munich, Germany), PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #38) - PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE (Munich, Germany), PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth Brust on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Brust, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE (Munich, Germany), Allianz of America, Inc., a subsidiary Allianz S.E., Munich, Germany, PFP Holdings Inc.. Document filed by William R. Seehafer, Paul Schaefer, Brian Jordan, Mark Jacobs, Marc Parker, Robert O'Toole..(Brooks, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Paul Schaefer, William R. Seehafer, Robert O'Toole, Allianz of America, Inc., a subsidiary Allianz S.E., Munich, Germany, Marc Parker, Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz SE (Munich, Germany), Mark Jacobs, Brian Jordan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Paul Schaefer, William R. Seehafer, Robert O'Toole, Allianz of America, Inc., a subsidiary Allianz S.E., Munich, Germany, Marc Parker, Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz SE (Munich, Germany), Mark Jacobs, Brian Jordan. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Brooks, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 1:20cv7842. (sj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Justin Silver Brooks to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Civil Cover Sheet consists of two pages. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (sj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Justin Silver Brooks to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the All Defendant radio button was selected; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Paul Schaefer; Robert O'Toole; Marc Parker; Brian Jordan; Mark Jacobs and William R. Seehafer; Allianz SE; Allianz Assest Management GMBH; Allianz of America, Inc. must be added to the docket. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) Modified on 11/16/2020 (sj). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-07842. Document filed by United Food & Commercial Workers Union-Employer Pension Fund, and its Trustees..(Brooks, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brooks, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2020 (sj). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22582394)Document filed by United Food & Commercial Workers Union-Employer Pension Fund, and its Trustees, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, PFP Holdings Inc., Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc..(Brooks, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2020 (sj). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PFP Holdings Inc. is a litigant