This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:12:35 (UTC).

UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY v. MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Karen M. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY

Defendants

UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION

LISA PRATTA

MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC

EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY

EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.

UNITED BIOSOURCE LLC

CIGNA CORPORATION

CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY

CURASCRIPT SD

MALLINCKRODT PLC

PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC.

ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC.

CURASCRIPT, INC.

PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC. doing business as CURASCRIPT SD doing business as CURASCRIPT SPECIALTY DISTRIBUTION SD

MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC.

Questcor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD E. HAVILAND, JR.

Attorney at Haviland Hughes

201 S. Maple Way, Suite 110

Ambler, PA 19002

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES J. O'HARA

Attorney at TOMPKINS, McGUIRE, WACHENFELD, & BARRY LLP

3 Becker Farm Road, Suite 402

Roseland, NJ 07068-1726

BRIAN M. ENGLISH

Attorney at TOMPKINS, MCGUIRE, WACHENFELD & BARRY, LLP

3 Becker Farm Road, Fourth Floor

Roseland, NJ 07068-1726

ROSS BEGELMAN

Attorney at BEGELMAN & ORLOW, P.C.

411 Route 70 East, Suite 245

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

MARC M. ORLOW

Attorney at BEGELMAN & ORLOW, PC

411 Route 70 East, Suite 245

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

JONATHAN D. WEISS

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN, LLP

15000 Midlantic Drive, Suite 200, P.O. Box 5429

Mount Laurel, NJ 08054

MATTHEW J. BEHR

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN

15000 Midlantic Drive, Suite 200, P.O. Box 5429

Mount Laurel, NJ 08054

 

Court Documents

50 #3

Certificate of Service

50 #2

Text of Proposed Order

50 #1

Brief

#50

(#50) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

49 #3

Certificate of Service

49 #2

Brief

49 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#49

(#49) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Amended Complaint by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

48 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. BEHR on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC (BEHR, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 03:30 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/6/2020. (cry, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (WEISS, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT PLC .. (WEISS, JONATHAN) Modified on 1/6/2020 (dmr, ). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division, Camden County, case number CAM-L-4696-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10224624), filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(WEISS, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Amended Complaint by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION re #41 Joint MOTION to Strike #40 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) RESPONSE to Motion filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #41 Joint MOTION to Strike #40 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #25 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of D. Haviland, #3 Certificate of Service)(HAVILAND, DONALD) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(HAVILAND, DONALD) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(HAVILAND, DONALD) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #43 MOTION to Strike. Motion set for 4/6/2020 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Strike by LISA PRATTA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOW, MARC) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SCHEDULING ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an Opposition brief to Mallinckrodt and the ESI Defendants' Motion to Strike on or before 3/3/2020; Mallinckrodt and the ESI Defendants may file a Reply brief to Plaintiff's Opposition on or before 3/5/2020, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/26/2020. (dmr) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION.. (ENGLISH, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN M. ENGLISH on behalf of ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION (ENGLISH, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. BEHR on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC (BEHR, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 03:30 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/6/2020. (cry, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (WEISS, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT PLC .. (WEISS, JONATHAN) Modified on 1/6/2020 (dmr, ). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division, Camden County, case number CAM-L-4696-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10224624), filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(WEISS, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less