This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2021 at 07:50:52 (UTC).

United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. 6401 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2021 United African-Asian Abilities Club filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against 6401 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00909

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members

Anna Marie Wiggins

United African-Asian Abilities Club

Defendants

6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD, LLC

1757 NORTH ORANGE DRIVE LLC

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Wakefield

Attorney at Lightning Law APC

10620 Treena Street Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, Anna Marie Wigginsto Order to Show Cause #10 (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#10

(#10) (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 2/19/2021. (See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics). (jp) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (sw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants 1757 North Orange Drive LLC, 6401 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying 6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD, LLC; 1757 NORTH ORANGE DRIVE LLC. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Text Only Entry: Upon review of Plaintiff's Response #12 and the First Amended Complaint #11 , the Court hereby DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause that was issued on February 9, 2021 #10 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, Anna Marie Wigginsto Order to Show Cause #10 (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants 1757 North Orange Drive LLC, 6401 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, Anna Marie Wiggins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To FAC, #2 Exhibit B To FAC, #3 Appendix FAC - Redlined)(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 2/19/2021. (See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics). (jp) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (sw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants 1757 North Orange Drive LLC, 6401 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying 6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD, LLC; 1757 NORTH ORANGE DRIVE LLC. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30336547 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Anna Marie Wiggins(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C Wakefield