This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:28:56 (UTC).

United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Third Street Investment Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 United African-Asian Abilities Club filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Third Street Investment Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07494

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United African-Asian Abilities Club

Jessie James Davis IV

Defendants

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Third Street Investment Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Wakefield

Attorney at Lightning Law APC

10620 Treena Street Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorney

Laura K Kim

Attorney at Musick Peeler and Garrett LLP

One Wilshire Building, 624 South Grand Avenue Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3383

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT SERVED UPON DEFENDANT THIRD STREET INVESTMENT GROUP, INC. #9 by Judge John F. Walter. The deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to October 30, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 30, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Third Street Investment Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Laura K Kim added to party Third Street Investment Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kim, Laura) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Third Street Investment Group, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying THIRD STREET INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B to Civil Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Civil Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27697314 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT SERVED UPON DEFENDANT THIRD STREET INVESTMENT GROUP, INC. #9 by Judge John F. Walter. The deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to October 30, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 30, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Third Street Investment Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Laura K Kim added to party Third Street Investment Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kim, Laura) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Third Street Investment Group, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying THIRD STREET INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27697314 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less