This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2021 at 09:50:03 (UTC).

United African Asian Abilities Club et al v. Garden Green, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 United African Asian Abilities Club filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Garden Green, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06031

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members

Jessie James Davis IV

United African Asian Abilities Club

Defendants

GARDEN GREEN, LTD.

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Wakefield

Attorney at Lightning Law APC

10620 Treena Street Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African Asian Abilities Clubto Order to Show Cause, #10 (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of David C. Wakefield, Esq. re Order to Show Cause, #10 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African Asian Abilities Club. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by August 11, 2021 why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. (iv) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Garden Green, Ltd. (jtil) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying GARDEN GREEN, LTD.. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B to Civil Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Civil Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African Asian Abilities Clubto Order to Show Cause, #10 (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of David C. Wakefield, Esq. re Order to Show Cause, #10 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African Asian Abilities Club. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by August 11, 2021 why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. (iv) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Garden Green, Ltd. (jtil) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying GARDEN GREEN, LTD.. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31695661 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDEN GREEN LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C Wakefield