This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:27:43 (UTC).

United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Directors Guild of America, et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 United African-Asian Abilities Club filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Directors Guild of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04017

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United African-Asian Abilities Club

Anna Marie Wiggins

Defendants

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

BIT Holdings Seventy-Two, Inc.

Legacy Partners Sunset Lofts LLC

Directors Guild of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Wakefield

Attorney at Lightning Law APC

10620 Treena Street Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorney

Brian D Huben

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2909

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #9 , the deadline for Defendants BIT Holdings Seventy-Two, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the initial complaint in this action shall be extended to 7/14/2021. (gk) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Complaint as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BIT Holdings Seventy-Two, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint)(Attorney Brian D Huben added to party BIT Holdings Seventy-Two, Inc.(pty:dft))(Huben, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants BIT Holdings Seventy-Two, Inc., Directors Guild of America, Inc., Legacy Partners Sunset Lofts LLC. (esa) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC.; BIT HOLDINGS SEVENTY-TWO, INC.; LEGACY PARTNERS SUNSET LOFTS LLC. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31288162 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Anna Marie Wiggins(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGACY PARTNERS SUNSET LOFT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BIT HOLDINGS SEVENTY-TWO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members is a litigant