This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 10:56:10 (UTC).

United African-Asian Abilities Club, et al v. 8250 Lankershim Owner, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 United African-Asian Abilities Club filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against 8250 Lankershim Owner, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06047

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members

Jessie James Davis IV

United African-Asian Abilities Club

Defendants

8250 LANKERSHIM OWNER, LLC

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Wakefield

Attorney at Lightning Law APC

10620 Treena Street Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 8/26/2021. (See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics). (jp) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United African-Asian Abilities Club, Jessie James Davis IV, upon Defendant 8250 Lankershim Owner, LLC served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Clubto Order to Show Cause #13 (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#12

(#12) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (sw) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 8250 Lankershim Owner, LLC. (jp) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying 8250 LANKERSHIM OWNER, LLC. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B to Civil Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Civil Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United African-Asian Abilities Club, Jessie James Davis IV, upon Defendant 8250 Lankershim Owner, LLC served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Clubto Order to Show Cause #13 (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 8/26/2021. (See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics). (jp) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (sw) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 8250 Lankershim Owner, LLC. (jp) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying 8250 LANKERSHIM OWNER, LLC. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31699705 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C Wakefield