This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2021 at 11:35:29 (UTC).

Unite the Parks et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Unite the Parks filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against U S Forest Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00518

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Helena M. Barch-Kuchta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Earth Island Institute

Sequoia ForestKeeper

Unite the Parks

Defendants

United States Forest Service

United States Fish and Wildlife Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rene Peter Voss

Attorney at Rene P. Voss, Attorney at Law

15 Alderney Road

San Anselmo, CA 94960-1601

Deborah Ann Sivas

Attorney at Environmental Law Clinic

559 Nathan Abbott Way

Stanford, CA 94305-8610

Matthew J. Sanders

Attorney at Environmental Law Clinic

559 Nathan Abbott Way

Stanford, CA 94305-8610

Defendant Attorneys

Bridget Kennedy McNeil

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

999 18Th Street, South Terrace, Suite 370

Denver, CO 80202

John Tustin, GOVT

Attorney at U.S. Department Of Justice

P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline re #1 Complaint by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

22 #1

Affidavit Second Kuyper Declaration

#22

(#22) REPLY by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service to RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Kuyper Declaration)(McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

21 #5

Proposed Order Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Pre

21 #2

Declaration Second Declaration of Chad Hanson in Support of Plaintiffs' Mot

21 #1

Declaration Second Declaration of Rene Voss in Support of Plaintiffs' Motio

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Memorandum

#17

(#17) MOTION to STRIKE Plaintiffs' Declarations ECF Nos. 9-3, 9-6, 9-7. by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John Tustin, GOVT on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. Attorney Tustin, John added. (Tustin, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

4 #4

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

4 #3

VDRP

4 #2

Consent Form

4 #1

Standing Order

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 11:30 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP, #4 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency) (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Deborah A. Sivas* *599 Nathan Abbott Way* *Stanford, CA 94305*. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Earth Island Istitute, Sequoia ForestKeeper, Unite the Parks (Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#1

(#24) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline re #1 Complaint by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 5/20/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties stipulation and order for extension of time #24 is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint no later than June 29, 2021.(Dunbar-Kari, K) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline re #1 Complaint by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 5/18/2021. #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #17 Motion to Strike argued and submitted. Motions are submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiffs' Counsel Deborah Sivas, Rene Voss, Sidni Frederick, and Catherine Rocchi (Zoom) present. Defendants' Counsel Bridget McNeil and John Tustin (Zoom) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven (Zoom) present. (Thorp, J) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service to RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Kuyper Declaration)(McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY by Earth Island Institute, Sequoia ForestKeeper, Unite the Parks re #13 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Declaration of Rene Voss in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Second Declaration of Chad Hanson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration Second Declaration of Ara Marderosian in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration Second Declaration of Deanna Wulff in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Proposed Order Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) OPPOSITION by Earth Island Institute, Sequoia ForestKeeper, Unite the Parks to #17 Motion to Strike,. (Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/6/2021: (Text Only Entry) On May 4, 2021, defendants filed a #17 motion to strike certain expert declarations filed by plaintiffs in support of their #9 motion for preliminary injunction. In order to address this #17 motion prior to ruling on the pending #9 motion for preliminary injunction, both motions will be heard on May 18, 2021 at 10:30 A.M. Plaintiffs' response to the #17 motion to strike shall be filed no later than May 11, 2021. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by May 14, 2021. (Thorp, J) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Kyle Kinports in opposition to #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs. 1-13, #2 Exhibit Exh. 14-1, #3 Exhibit Exh. 14-2, #4 Exhibit Exh. 15, #5 Exhibit Exhs. 16-31)(McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to STRIKE Plaintiffs' Declarations ECF Nos. 9-3, 9-6, 9-7. by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Marc Meyer in opposition to #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,. (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2021: (Text Only Entry) To accommodate the court's calendar, the #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 5/18/2021 WILL BE HEARD at 10:30 AM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Parties on this case must appear via Zoom. Parties will receive Zoom ID number and password for the hearing by email one week prior to hearing. Any persons not a named party to this case whom wish to attend this motion MUST phone in telephonically by dialing 877-402-9757, access code 6966236 at the time of hearing. (Thorp, J) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Earth Island Institute, Sequoia ForestKeeper, Unite the Parks. Attorney Sivas, Deborah Ann added. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Rene Voss, #3 Declaration Chad Hanson, #4 Declaration Ara Marderosian, #5 Declaration Deborah A. Sivas, #6 Declaration Joseph Werne, #7 Declaration Deanna Wulff, #8 Declaration Alison Sheehey, #9 Proposed Order)(Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bridget Kennedy McNeil on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. Attorney McNeil, Bridget Kennedy added. (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John Tustin, GOVT on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. Attorney Tustin, John added. (Tustin, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 11:30 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP, #4 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency) (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Deborah A. Sivas* *599 Nathan Abbott Way* *Stanford, CA 94305*. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Earth Island Istitute, Sequoia ForestKeeper, Unite the Parks (Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Sivas, Deborah Ann added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9505496) (Sivas, Deborah) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Park Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J. Sanders