This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:15:57 (UTC).

Miller et al v. New Harrison Hotel Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Miller filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against New Harrison Hotel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07611

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Trustees

Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund

Daniel Miller

Defendants

New Harrison Hotel Corporation

New Harrison Hotel Corporation an Illinois Corporation administrator d/b/a Travelodge Chicago

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Trustee Attorneys

Elizabeth L. Rowe

Attorney at Dowd, Bloch, Bennett, Cervone, Auerbach & Yokich

8 S. Michigan Ave., 19Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60603

Jeremy Michael Barr

Attorney at Dowd, Bloch, Bennett, Cervone & Auerbach & Yokich

8 S. Michigan Ave., 19Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline K. Kane

Attorney at Franczek P.C.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60606

William R Pokorny

Attorney at Franczek Radelet PC

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Pursuant to the joint stipulation #16 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. The dismissal will become with prejudice on March 15, 2020. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Leave to Reinstate (Joint) (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#15

(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by Caroline K. Kane (Kane, Caroline) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by William R Pokorny (Pokorny, William) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time until January 15, 2020 to answer the complaint #12 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation for extension of time , MOTION by Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation for extension of time to file answer (Kane, Caroline) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#11

(#11) (PDF not legible) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by Caroline K. Kane (Kane, Caroline) Modified on 12/13/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

(#10) (PDF not legible) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by William R Pokorny (Pokorny, William) Modified on 12/13/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Miller, Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund as to Daniel Miller on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Barr, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

8 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations, filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Miller, Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Barr, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

7 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations, filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Miller, Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 2/6/20 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Daniel Miller, Plaintiff Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund by Jeremy Michael Barr (Barr, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Daniel Miller, Plaintiff Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund by Elizabeth L. Rowe (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Pursuant to the joint stipulation #16 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. The dismissal will become with prejudice on March 15, 2020. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Leave to Reinstate (Joint) (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by Caroline K. Kane (Kane, Caroline) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by William R Pokorny (Pokorny, William) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time until January 15, 2020 to answer the complaint #12 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation for extension of time , MOTION by Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation for extension of time to file answer (Kane, Caroline) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) (PDF not legible) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by Caroline K. Kane (Kane, Caroline) Modified on 12/13/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (PDF not legible) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation by William R Pokorny (Pokorny, William) Modified on 12/13/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Miller, Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund as to Daniel Miller on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Barr, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations, filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Miller, Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Barr, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations, filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Miller, Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 2/6/20 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant New Harrison Hotel Corporation (txl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Daniel Miller, Plaintiff Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund by Jeremy Michael Barr (Barr, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Daniel Miller, Plaintiff Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund by Elizabeth L. Rowe (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Miller, Unite Here Chicago Hospitality Apprenticeship Fund ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16451357.(Rowe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.