This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:18:58 (UTC).

UNISYS CORPORATION v. NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 UNISYS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03829

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNISYS CORPORATION

Defendant

NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA

Attorney at CONRAD O'BRIEN

1500 Market St., Centre Square, West Tower 39Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNISYS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UNISYS CORPORATION.(rf, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE202510 filed by UNISYS CORPORATION, JURY TRIAL DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(rf, ) Modified on 8/26/2019 (rf, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/28/2019) (rf, ). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNISYS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UNISYS CORPORATION.(rf, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by UNISYS CORPORATION. (rf, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • 1 Original Summons Issued as to NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 8/23/19. (rf, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE202510 filed by UNISYS CORPORATION, JURY TRIAL DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(rf, ) Modified on 8/26/2019 (rf, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/28/2019) (rf, ). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less