This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2021 at 08:10:19 (UTC).

Union v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Union filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00779

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ron Union

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lonnie Roach

Attorney at Law Offices of Bemis, Roach & Reed, LLP

4100 Duval Road, Building 1, #200

Austin, TX 78759

Defendant Attorney

Linda P. Wills

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

909 Fannin Street, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ron Union as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Roach, Lonnie) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Linda P. Wills added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Linda P. Wills added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ron Union as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Roach, Lonnie) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15187883). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ron Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Roach, Lonnie) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda P Wills