This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 08:23:09 (UTC).

Union Pacific Railroad Company v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Union Pacific Railroad Company filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05502

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Norfolk Southern Railway Co.

Petitioner

BNSF Railway Company

Defendants

International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division

Roy Davis

Luke EDINGTON

SCOTT CHELETTE

TERRY DIXON

BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES, DIVISION IBT

Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy J. Glenn

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

123 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

Andrew J. Rolfes

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Matthew T. DiCianni

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

123 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

Robert S. Hawkins

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Donald J. Munro

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

James M Burnham

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Samantha Woo

Attorney at Jones Day

77 W. Wacker, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Erika A Diehl-Gibbons

Attorney at Smart Transportation Division

24950 Country Club Blvd., Ste. 340

North Olmsted, OH 44070

Kevin C. Brodar

Attorney at Smart Transportation Division

24950 Country Club Blvd., #340

North Olmsted, OH 44070

Robert Earl Harrington, III

Attorney at DUNN HARRINGTON LLC

22 W. Washington St., Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60602

Shawn Mckinley

Attorney at Smart-td

24950 Country Club Blvd., 340

North Olmsted, OH 44070

Richard S. Edelman

Attorney at Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy, and Welch PC

1920 L Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Karen I. Engelhardt

Attorney at Allison, Slutsky & Kennedy, P.C.

230 West Monroe Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60606

Wesley G. S. Kennedy

Attorney at Allison, Slutsky & Kennedy, P.C.

230 West Monroe Street, #2600

Chicago, IL 60606

Joshua D. McInerney

Attorney at Wentz, McInerney, Peifer & Petroff, LLC

Suite 210, 3311 Bear Pointe Cir.,

Powell, OH 43065

Dimitre James Petroff

Attorney at Wentz, McInerney, Peifer & Petroff, LLC

3311 Bear Pointe Cir

Powell, OH 43065

Matthew Pierce

Attorney at Asher, Gittler & D'Alba, Ltd.

200 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 720

Chicago, IL 60606

Ryan A Hagerty

Attorney at Asher, Gittler & D'Alba

200 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 720

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#65

(#65) CONSOLIDATED AMENDED complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Co. against All Defendants (DiCianni, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#64

(#64) SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company to motion for preliminary injunction, #42 , motion for preliminary injunction, #41 in opposition (DiCianni, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

42 #3

Declaration D. Phillips

42 #2

Declaration L.Edington

42 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

41 #3

Declaration of Randy Fannon

41 #2

Declaration of Brian Carr

41 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief

#41

(#56) MEMORANDUM by Norfolk Southern Railway Co. in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction, #42 , motion for preliminary injunction, #41 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Moore)(Munro, Donald) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

6 #3

Exhibit C

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) CONSOLIDATED AMENDED complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Co. against All Defendants (DiCianni, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company to motion for preliminary injunction, #42 , motion for preliminary injunction, #41 in opposition (DiCianni, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status and motion hearing held on 12/7/21. For the reasons stated on the record, the joint motions for reassignment #49 #59 are denied. The motion for leave to file a sur-reply #61 is granted; the sur-reply brief should be filed by the end of the day today. Defendant's motion for preliminary injunction #41 #42 is entered and continued. Oral argument is set for 1/6/22 by 1:30 p.m. by video; the Court will set aside two hours for the hearing and will provide an agenda. If a motion requesting a evidentiary hearing is requested, a motion should be filed by 12/14/21. (ca, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE of Motion by Andrew J. Rolfes for presentment of motion for leave to file #61 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/7/2021 at 03:00 PM. (Rolfes, Andrew) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company for leave to file Sur Reply Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur Reply Motion)(Rolfes, Andrew) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/17/21 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION by Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Co. to reassign case (Joint) (Woo, Samantha) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) REPLY by Defendants SCOTT CHELETTE, TERRY DIXON, Roy Davis, Luke EDINGTON, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division to motion for preliminary injunction, #42 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Edington Decl., #2 Affidavit Second Phillips Decl.)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) REPLY by Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen to motion for preliminary injunction, #41 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Petroff, Dimitre) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MEMORANDUM by Norfolk Southern Railway Co. in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction, #42 , motion for preliminary injunction, #41 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Moore)(Munro, Donald) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18788045. (Hawkins, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Andrew Rolfes #5 is granted. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 12/15/21 at 9:15 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 12/8/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company against BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES, DIVISION IBT, SCOTT CHELETTE, TERRY DIXON, Roy Davis, Luke EDINGTON, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Glenn, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18773920. (Rolfes, Andrew) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Glenn, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company by Jeremy J. Glenn (Glenn, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Glenn, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18773644. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Glenn, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less