This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 09:39:15 (UTC).

Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Feek

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Union Pacific Railroad Company filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Feek. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-05028

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant

Cami Feek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Harrison Walsh

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR (SEA)

999 Third Avenue, Suite 1900

Seattle, WA 98104

Joseph P Sirbak, II

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR (PA)

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Katy J Dixon

Attorney General'S Office (Sea-Fifth Ave), 800 5Th Ave

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Aaron Jacob Berger Smith

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (1125 WASH)

1125 Washington St Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Union Pacific Railroad Company (Receipt # AWAWDC-7843273), filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Cami Feek)(Walsh, William) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons to Cami Feek

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Cami Feek (CR) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Walsh, William) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katy J Dixon on behalf of Defendant Cami Feek. (Dixon, Katy) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/30/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/14/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/21/2023, Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2023, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#9

(#9) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendant Cami Feek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion For Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings (FRCP 12(a)(1)(A))) Noting Date 1/31/2023, (Dixon, Katy) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

9 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion For Extension of Time f

#11

(#11) PRAECIPE to attach document (Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) for Attorney Joseph P. Sirbak II (Receipt No. AWAWDC-7871610) by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company (Walsh, William) Modified on 2/1/2023 to add receipt number and clean up entry (JWC). (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Jacob Berger Smith on behalf of Defendant Cami Feek. (Smith, Aaron) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#13

(#13) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay 26(f) Conference Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report, filed by Defendant Cami Feek. Noting Date 2/13/2023, (Dixon, Katy) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1), filed by Defendant Cami Feek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Cami Feek's Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 3/31/2023, (Dixon, Katy) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER (text only) denying #13 Stipulated MOTION to Stay 26(f) Conference Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report. The Court declines to stay the initial case scheduling deadlines. Finding the parties' request to set the deadlines 45 days after the deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to be excessive, the Court extends the initial case deadlines as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/21/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/28/2023, Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2023. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay 26(f) Conference Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report, filed by Defendant Cami Feek. Noting Date 2/13/2023, (Dixon, Katy) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph P. Sirbak, II for Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) Modified on 2/2/2023 to correct docket number of application (JWC). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Jacob Berger Smith on behalf of Defendant Cami Feek. (Smith, Aaron) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PRAECIPE to attach document (Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) for Attorney Joseph P. Sirbak II (Receipt No. AWAWDC-7871610) by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company (Walsh, William) Modified on 2/1/2023 to add receipt number and clean up entry (JWC). (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings. The deadline for Defendant to file responsive pleadings pursuant to FRCP 12(a)(1)(A) is extended to 3/7/2023. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendant Cami Feek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion For Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings (FRCP 12(a)(1)(A))) Noting Date 1/31/2023, (Dixon, Katy) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/14/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/21/2023, Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2023, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/30/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katy J Dixon on behalf of Defendant Cami Feek. (Dixon, Katy) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Walsh, William) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:23-cv-00052 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number and Judge assignment: 3:23-cv-05028-DWC. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (CR) Modified on 1/11/2023 (CR). (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Cami Feek (CR) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/18/2023. (CR) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Union Pacific Railroad Company (Receipt # AWAWDC-7843273), filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Cami Feek)(Walsh, William) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less