Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2020 at 08:45:19 (UTC).

Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Arch Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Union Pacific Railroad Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arch Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan M. Bazis and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant

Arch Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew O. Sitzer

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY LAW FIRM - CHICAGO

111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel E. Cummings

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY LAW FIRM - KANSAS CITY

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Erika A. Dirk

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY LAW FIRM - CHICAGO

111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60606

Joe Rebein

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY LAW FIRM - KANSAS CITY

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Defendant Attorney

A. Victor Rawl, Jr.

Attorney at GORDON, REES LAW FIRM - SOUTH CAROLINA

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

23 #3

Exhibit C - UPR Arbitration Demand

23 #2

Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim

23 #1

Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement

#23

(#23) RESPONSE regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #4 by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim, #3 Exhibit C - UPR Arbitration Demand)(Rawl, A.) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

22 #3

Exhibit C - Arch Arbitration Demand

22 #2

Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim

22 #1

Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement

#22

(#22) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative,Stay Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgment Action #21 by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim, #3 Exhibit C - Arch Arbitration Demand, #4 Exhibit D - UPR Arbitration Demand)(Rawl, A.) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative,Stay Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgment Action by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Arch Insurance Company.(Rawl, A.) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit B - Mediation Agreement

5 #1

Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement

#5

(#8) SUPPLEMENT regarding Brief, #5 Corrected Exhibit C by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#4

(#20) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 is extended to May 1, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim

1 #1

Exhibit A - Industry Tracking Agreement

#1

(#3) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #4 by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim, #3 Exhibit C - UPR Arbitration Demand)(Rawl, A.) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative,Stay Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgment Action #21 by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim, #3 Exhibit C - Arch Arbitration Demand, #4 Exhibit D - UPR Arbitration Demand)(Rawl, A.) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative,Stay Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgment Action by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Arch Insurance Company.(Rawl, A.) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 is extended to May 1, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Answer to Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Arch Insurance Company.(Rawl, A.) Modified on 3/30/2020 per attorney's request to add stipulated (LRM). (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Arch Insurance Company on 3/10/2020. (Dirk, Erika) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Erika A. Dirk. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Matthew O. Sitzer. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4127377 by Attorney Erika A. Dirk on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Dirk, Erika) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4127373 by Attorney Matthew O. Sitzer on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Sitzer, Matthew) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Matthew Sitzer has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (ADB) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joe Rebein has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (ADB) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT regarding Brief, #5 Corrected Exhibit C by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to defendant Arch Insurance Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ADB) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #4 by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Industry Track Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Mediation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment of Claim, #4 Exhibit D - Arbitration Demand)(Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Arch Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4126371), by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Industry Tracking Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Claim)(Cummings, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel E. Cummins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erika Anne Dirk