This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 08:53:03 (UTC).

Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) v. CG Printing Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against CG Printing Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01043

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO)

UPAGRA

Defendant

CG Printing Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miguel Simonet-Sierra

Attorney at Monserratre Simonet & Gierbolini

101 Ave. San Patricio, Suite 1120

Guaynabo, PR 00968

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/10/2020. (MPL) Modified on 2/11/2020 to remove court only restriction (gmm). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#22

(#22) Joint NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO). (cmd) Modified on 2/12/2020 to correct filer (mr). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#2

(#6) ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion for Leave to File Documents in the Spanish Language and Extension of Time to File Translations." Certified English translations due not later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/27/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Category Sheet

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6761126.), filed by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO). Service due by 4/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons)(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/10/2020. (MPL) Modified on 2/11/2020 to remove court only restriction (gmm). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: Granting #22 "Joint Notice of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal." Based on the representations made therein, the case is dismissed without prejudice, without imposition of costs and attorney's fees. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/10/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Joint NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2020. Present on behalf of plaintiff was Attorney Miguel Simonet. Present on behalf of the defendant were Attorneys Julio Lugo and Ricard Schell. The Court met with the parties in chambers. The Court afforded the parties time to discuss the controversy and a possible resolution. The parties informed the Court that they've reached an agreement. The agreement will result in the dismissal without prejudice of the case and without the imposition of costs or attorneys' fees. The parties will file a joint motion today with the terms pursuant to which the Court will dismiss the case. (Court Reporter Evelys Carrion.) (cmd) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Noting #19 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/7/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO). (cmd) Modified on 2/12/2020 to correct filer (mr). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: Granting in Part #15 "Motion for Leave to File Documents in the Spanish Language and Extension of Time to File Translations." However, only English language documents may be used during hearing set for tomorrow in connection with Plaintiff's injunctive relief request. See Order at Docket No. 17. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/6/2020. (cc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: Denying #16 "Plaintiff's Emergency Renewed Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order." Hearing, February 7, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/6/2020. (cc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE 12(B) (6) OF CIVIL PROCEDURE as to All Defendants filed by Julio I. Lugo-Munoz on behalf of CG Printing Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lugo-Munoz, Julio) Modified on 1/31/2020 as to filer (gav). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed and Proof of Services by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) upon CG Printing Group, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt Order Docket #8, #2 Exhibit Proof of Services) (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Defendant shall discuss the merits of plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief by the same day it answers or otherwise pleads. Plaintiff shall serve upon defendant a copy of this ORDER today. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/28/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/27/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion for Leave to File Documents in the Spanish Language and Extension of Time to File Translations." Certified English translations due not later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/27/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to CG Printing Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6761126.), filed by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO). Service due by 4/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons)(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miguel Simonet-Sierra