This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 08:13:03 (UTC).

Uniloc 2017 LLC v. H and R Block, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Uniloc 2017 LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against H and R Block, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary A. Fenner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00659

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary A. Fenner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Uniloc 2017 LLC

Defendants

H and R Block, Inc.

H&R Block Enterprises LLC

HRB Digital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Seth Jacobs

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

James J Foster

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

Matthew David Vella

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

357 South Coast Highway, Suite 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

Michael L. Nepple

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP - StL

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant Attorneys

Keith B Davis

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood Street Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Matthew J Silveira

Attorney at Jones Day

555 California Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael C Hendershot

Attorney at Jones Day

1755 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Andrea Weiss Jeffries

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#63

#62

61 #1

*Restricted*

#61

60 #1

MINUTE ORDER CLOSING CASE

#60

#59

43 #2

Declaration of Danielle Hilton

43 #1

Memorandum

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#64) Order of Dismissal. Signed on 9/3/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of appearance by Michael L. Nepple on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Attorney Michael L. Nepple added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Nepple, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Nepple, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 8:19-cv-01149. (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING CASE) (shb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and TRANSFERS Unilocs claims against HRB Digital to the Western District of Missouri. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (shb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #43 previously set for 12/9/2019 at 1:30 pm is continued to 12/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #43 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court sets Defendants motion for hearing on December 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. The Status Conference set by Judge Carter for December 4, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. is ordered VACATED. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE filed. Pursuant to minute order filed on 11/08/2019. Case returned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 8:19-cv-01149 JVS(KESx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RESCINDING TRANSFER ORDER #51 AND SCHEDULING ORDER #53 . Should the motion to dismiss be denied, the Court remains amenable to the transfer of this case. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #9 Non-Resident Attorney James J. Foster APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, designating Matthew D. Vella as local counsel. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James J. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23959358) Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vella, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC Uniloc 2017 LLC. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01062 (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23890588 - Fee: $400, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Aaron Seth Jacobs added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H&R Block Enterprises LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HRB Digital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where H and R Block, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc 2017 LLC is a litigant