This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2019 at 07:12:39 (UTC).

Uniloc 2017 LLC v. H and R Block, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Uniloc 2017 LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against H and R Block, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01149

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Uniloc 2017 LLC

Defendants

H and R Block, Inc.

HRB Digital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Seth Jacobs

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

Matthew David Vella

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

357 South Coast Highway Suite 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

James J Foster

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

Michael C Hendershot

Attorney at Jones Day

1755 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Andrea Weiss Jeffries

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants HRB Digital LLC, H and R Block, Inc..(Jeffries, Andrea) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrea Weiss Jeffries on behalf of Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC (Attorney Andrea Weiss Jeffries added to party H and R Block, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Weiss Jeffries added to party HRB Digital LLC(pty:dft))(Jeffries, Andrea) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, upon Defendant H and R Block, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bonnie Love, Intake Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, upon Defendant HRB Digital LLC served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant H and R Block, Inc.. (es) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC. (es) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/12/2019. (lb) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:19-cv-01062 AG(DFMx) (rn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #9 Non-Resident Attorney James J. Foster APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, designating Matthew D. Vella as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James J. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23959358) Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vella, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC Uniloc 2017 LLC. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01062 (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23890588 - Fee: $400, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Aaron Seth Jacobs added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Jacobs, Aaron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HRB Digital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where H and R Block, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc 2017 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Hendershot